No. 23A534
Title:Jay Hymas, dba Dosmen Farms, Applicant
v.
Department of Interior
Docketed:December 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35733)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2023Application (23A534) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2023 to February 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 12 2023Application (23A534) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Anthony Scodro
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

mscodro@mayerbrown.com
312-782-0600
Party name: Jay Hymas
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Interior