No. 23A532
Title:Franco P. Clement, Applicant
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:December 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13382)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2023Application (23A532) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2024 to March 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 07 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 12 2023Application (23A532) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 21, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Seventh Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Franco P. Clement
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Att'y Gen.