No. 23A528
Title:Raymond H. Pierson, III, Applicant
v.
CSAA Insurance Services, Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 12, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C091099)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2023Application (23A528) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2023 to February 17, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 12 2023Application (23A528) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 17, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raymond H. Pierson II3 Gopher Flat Rd. #7
Sutter Creek, CA 95685

(209) 267-9118
Party name: Raymond Pierson