No. 23A526
Title:Jacob Smith, Applicant
v.
Nethanjah Breitenbach, Warden, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15278)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2023Application (23A526) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2023 to February 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Dec 11 2023Application (23A526) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Smith
    Counsel of Record
#53917
P.O. Box 7000
Carson City, NV 89702

Party name: Jacob Smith