No. 23A524
Title:835 Hinesburg Road, LLC, Applicant
v.
City of South Burlington, Vermont, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-218)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2023Application (23A524) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to March 20, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Dec 13 2023Application (23A524) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 20, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Daly Valois
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd., Ste. 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

KVALOIS@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
5616915000
Party name: 835 Hinesburg Road, LLC