No. 23A522
Title:Gary Wayne Warner, Applicant
v.
Texas
Docketed:December 8, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-52,843-13)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2023Application (23A522) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2023 to January 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Dec 08 2023Application (23A522) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Warner Gary Wayne
    Counsel of Record
00861634
Coffield Unit
2661 FM 2054
Tenn.Colony, TX 75884

Party name: Warner G. Wayne