No. 23A516
Title:Ronald D. Houston, aka Hassan Blue, aka Ron Reezy, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 7, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2663)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2023Application (23A516) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2023 to February 17, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Application (23A516) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 17, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Keith Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender, E.D. Missouri
1010 Market Street
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63101

tyler_morgan@fd.org
3142411255
Party name: Ronald Houston
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States