No. 23A514
Title:David James Lack, Applicant
v.
Matthew Rodriguez
Docketed:December 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-55583)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2023Application (23A514) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2023 to January 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 06 2023Application (23A514) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David James Lack10105 East Via Linda, Suite 453
Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Party name: David Lack