No. 23A511
Title:No on E, San Franciscans Opposing the Affordable Care Housing Production Act, et al., Applicants
v.
David Chiu, in His Official Capacity as San Francisco City Attorney, et al.
Docketed:December 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15824)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2023Application (23A511) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2024 to February 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Application (23A511) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue N.W.
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

AGURA@IFS.ORG
202.301.3300
Party name: No on E, San Franciscans Opposing the Affordable Housing Production Act, et al.