No. 23A503
Title:Kathy Allen, et al., Applicants
v.
L3Harris Technologies, Inc.
Docketed:December 4, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1528)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 30 2023Application (23A503) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 24, 2023 to February 22, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 04 2023Application (23A503) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kathy Allen
    Counsel of Record
26 55th Street NE
Washington DC, DC 20019

202-399-6225
Party name: Kathy Allen, et al.