No. 23A496 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Moises Sandoval Mendoza, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:December 1, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-70035)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2023Application (23A496) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2024 to April 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Application (23A496) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Matthew Zarrow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jzarrow@omm.com
213-430-8367
Party name: Moises Sandoval Mendoza