No. 23A491
Title:Lamar Larue White, Applicant
v.
California
Docketed:November 30, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S280302)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2023Application (23A491) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2023 to January 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Nov 30 2023Application (23A491) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lamar Larue WhiteAW1425
Donovan Correctional Facility
480 Alta Rd.
San Diego, CA 92179

Party name: Lamar Larue White