No. 23A479
Title:Hannibal Eason, Applicant
v.
Kwame Raoul, Attorney General of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:November 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3126)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2023Application (23A479) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2023 to February 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 28 2023Application (23A479) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until February 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hannibal Eason
    Counsel of Record
#M03226
Dixon Correctional Center
2600 North Brinton Avenue, P.O. Box 1200
Dixon, IL 61021

Party name: Hannibal Eason