No. 23A466
Title:Melissa Ing, Applicant
v.
Tufts University
Docketed:November 22, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1030)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2023Application (23A466) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2023 to February 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Application (23A466) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until February 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Ing
    Counsel of Record
11 Berkeley Court
Brookline, MA 02445

860-214-4307
Party name: Melissa Ing