No. 23A465
Title:Peter Kleidman, Applicant
v.
Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District, et al.
Docketed:November 22, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S281040)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2023Application (23A465) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2023 to February 24, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Nov 22 2023Application (23A465) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Kleidman
    Counsel of Record
680 E. Main St., #506
Stamford, CT 06901

(971) 217-7819
Party name: Peter Kleidman