No. 23A460
Title:Sean M. Donahue, Applicant
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:November 21, 2023
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Pennsylvania, Harrisburg Office
   Case Numbers:(1168 MDA 2018, 920 MDA 2019, 1179 MDA 2019, 1582 MDA 2019, 589 MDA 2020, 947 MDA 2020, 502 MDA 2021, 182 MDA 2022)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2023Application (23A460) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2023 to February 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentMain Document
Nov 27 2023Application (23A460) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 9, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean M. Donahue
    Counsel of Record
625 Cleveland Street
Hazelton, PA 18201

(570) 454-5367
Party name: Sean M. Donahue