No. 23A445
Title:United States, Applicant
v.
David L. Miller
Docketed:November 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-4135)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2023Application (23A445) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 30, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 17 2023Application (23A445) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States