No. 23A442
Title:Jeffrey B. Israelitt, Applicant
v.
Enterprise Services, LLC
Docketed:November 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1382)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2023Application (23A442) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2023 to January 13, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 16 2023Application (23A442) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Jeffrey Israelitt