No. 23A432
Title:Diamond J. Wholesale, LLC, dba Gabsons Novelties, Applicant
v.
Top Tobacco, L.P., et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10926)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2023Application (23A432) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2023 to January 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 15 2023Application (23A432) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 20, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Alice Graf
    Counsel of Record
Jessica Graf Law, PLLC
2614 130th Street
Suite 5 PMB 1030
Lubbock, TX 79423

JESSICA@JESSICAGRAFLAW.COM
806-370-8006
Party name: Diamond J. Wholesale, LLC, d.b.a. Gabsons Novelties