No. 23A427 | |
Title: | Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., Applicants v. Federal Trade Commission |
Docketed: | November 13, 2023 |
Linked with 23-704 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-14161) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 08 2023 | Application (23A427) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2023 to January 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 13 2023 | Application (23A427) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 27, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Robert Foust Parsley Counsel of Record | Miller & Martin, PLLC 832 Georgia Avenue Suite 1200 Chattanooga, TN 37402 Bob.Parsley@millermartin.com | 4237858211 |
Party name: Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Federal Trade Commission, et al. |