No. 23A411
Title:Irvin Harris Johnson, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:November 8, 2023
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(13-CF-0493, 17-CO-0422, 20-CO-0609)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2023Application (23A411) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2023 to December 15, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2023Application (23A411) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 15, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

JGREEN@SIDLEY.COM
202 736 8291
Party name: Irvin Harris Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States