No. 23A406
Title:Sylvester Cunningham, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:November 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1080)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2023Application (23A406) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2023 to December 28, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Application (23A406) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 28, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Rae Quick
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office - Iowa
222 Third Avenue SE
Suite 290
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

HEATHER_QUICK@FD.ORG
319-363-9540
Party name: Sylvester Cunningham
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States