No. 23A384 | |
Title: | United States Steel Corporation, Applicant v. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. |
Docketed: | October 31, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1207 23-1157) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 26 2023 | Application (23A384) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentOther | |
Oct 31 2023 | Response to application (23A384) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on November 2, 2023. |
Nov 02 2023 | Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
Nov 02 2023 | Response to application from respondents New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County, TX filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 02 2023 | Response to application from respondent Environmental Defense Fund filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 03 2023 | Reply of applicant United States Steel Corporation filed. |
ReplyProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John David Lazzaretti Counsel of Record | Squire Sanders (US) LLP 1000 Key Tower 127 Public Square Cleveland, OH 44114 john.lazzaretti@squirepb.com | 2164798350 |
Party name: United States Steel Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Megan Marie Herzog Counsel of Record | Donahue & Goldberg, LLP 1008 Pennsylvania Avenue SE Washington, DC 20003 megan@donahuegoldberg.com | 650-353-8719 |
Party name: Environmental Defense Fund | ||
Barbara Dale Underwood Counsel of Record | Solicitor General Office of the Attorney General 28 Liberty Street New York, NY 10005-1400 BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV | 212-416-8016 |
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County, TX | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: U. S. Environmental Protection Agency |