No. 23A357
Title:Brant Putnam, et al., Applicants
v.
Timothy Ryan
Docketed:October 20, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-55144, 22-55406)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2023Application (23A357) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2023 to December 21, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 23 2023Application (23A357) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 21, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Manier
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Rosenberg Golper & Savitt
15760 Ventura Blvd., 18th Floor
Encino, CA 91436

jmanier@brgslaw.com
8185083700
Party name: Brant Putnam, et al.