No. 23A355
Title:Martin Akerman, Applicant
v.
Nevada National Guard
Docketed:October 18, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nevada
   Case Numbers:(86458)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2023Application (23A355) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2023 to November 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Oct 24 2023Application (23A355) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 23, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Akerman
    Counsel of Record
2001 North Adams Street
Unit 440
Arlington , VA 22201

202-656-5601
Party name: Martin Akerman