No. 23A349
Title:Ohio, et al., Applicants
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:October 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1183)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2023Application (23A349) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 19 2023Response to application (23A349) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on October 30, 2023.
Oct 30 2023Response to application from respondent EPA filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 30 2023Response to application from respondent New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County,TX filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 30 2023Response to application from respondent Public Interest Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 01 2023Reply of applicant Ohio, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathura Jaya Sridharan
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General's Office
30 E. Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215

Mathura.Sridharan@OhioAGO.gov
4408216380
Party name: Ohio, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Megan Marie Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Donahue & Goldberg, LLP
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

megan@donahuegoldberg.com
650-353-8719
Party name: Public Interest Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County,TX
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: EPA