No. 23A294
Title:Ryan Thornton, Applicant
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:October 4, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District II
   Case Numbers:(2023AP769-CR)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2023Application (23A294) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2023 to January 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 04 2023Application (23A294) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until January 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ryan Thornton4014 19th St.
Racine, WI 53405

ryan0410@gmail.com
(262) 939-4405
Party name: Ryan Thornton