No. 23A264
Title:Israel Alvarado, et al., Applicants
v.
Lloyd Austin, III, et al.
Docketed:September 26, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1419)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2023Application (23A264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2023 to December 8, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Application (23A264) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 8, 2023.
Nov 28 2023Renewed application of Israel Alvarado, et al. submitted.
Written Request

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Chaplains' Counsel, PLLC,
21043 Honeycreeper Pl.
Leesburg, VA 20175

art@chaplainscounsel.com
703-645-4010
Party name: Israel Alvarado, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Austin, III, Lloyd, et al.