No. 23A1177
Title:Andrew Fields, Applicant
v.
New York Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Docketed:July 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-7349)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2024Application (23A1177) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 11, 2024 to August 10, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Jul 03 2024Application (23A1177) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Fields
    Counsel of Record
04595-033
Gouverneur Correctional Facility
PO Box 480
Gouverneur, NY 13642

318-561-5300
Party name: Andrew Fields