No. 23A1176
Title:Sadick Edusei Kissi, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3220)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1176) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 21, 2024 to September 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 03 2024Application (23A1176) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lucas Arment Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Rothman. Schneider, Soloway & Stern, LLP
100 Lafayette Street. Suite*501
New York, NY 10013

LANDERSON@RSSSLAW.COM
2125715500
Party name: Sadick Edusei-Kissi
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States