No. 23A1175
Title:Dennis M. Buckovetz, Applicant
v.
Department of the Navy
Docketed:July 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-55284)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1175) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2024 to September 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jul 02 2024Application (23A1175) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Terry Mutchler
    Counsel of Record
Obermayer, Rebmann, Maxwell and Hippel LLP
1500 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19101

terry.mutchler@obermayer.com
(215) 665-3067
Party name: Dennis M. Buckovetz
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Dept. of the Navy