No. 23A1174
Title:Kevin Deane Jones, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10227)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2024Application (23A1174) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2024 to August 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 01 2024Application (23A1174) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laura J Daines
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender MDFL
400 N Tampa St
Ste 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

laura_daines@fd.org
813-514-2813
Party name: Kevin Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America