No. 23A1173
Title:Mark Kelly, Applicant
v.
Daniel Dorman, et al.
Docketed:July 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1765)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1173) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 8, 2024 to September 6, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Jul 03 2024Application (23A1173) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until September 6, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Kelly10955 South Fork Road
Dillsboro, IN 47018

(812) 667-6546
Party name: Mark Kelly