No. 23A1170
Title:Bryant D. Aron, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2364)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2024Application (23A1170) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2024 to September 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentOtherOtherLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 03 2024Application (23A1170) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until September 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Clay Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
University of Wisconsin Law School
975 Bascom Mall
Madison, WI 53706

ADAM.STEVENSON@WISC.EDU
6082629233
Party name: Bryant Aron
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States