No. 23A1168
Title:Alex Ryle, Applicant
v.
Brian Emig, Warden, James T. Vaughn Correctional Center, et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2839)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1168) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 23, 2024 to August 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1168) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alex Ryle
    Counsel of Record
#00463547
James T. Vaughn Correctional Center
1181 Paddock Rd.
Smyrna, DE 19977

Party name: Alex Ryle