No. 23A1167
Title:Jay A. Liestman, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3225)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1167) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2024 to August 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1167) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 7, 2024.
Jul 17 2024Application of Jay A. Liestman for a further extension of time submitted.
Written RequestProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

JLFISHER@OMM.COM
6504732600
Party name: Jay A. Liestman
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America