No. 23A1166
Title:Sabino Zuniga-Ayala, Applicant
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-60118)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1166) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2024 to August 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jun 25 2024Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1166) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 6, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law Sch. Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Sabino Zuniga-Ayala
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick