No. 23A1165 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Harry Franklin Phillips, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15714)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1165) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1165) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel-South
110 S.E. 6th Street, Suite 701
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

MARIE@SAMUELSPARMERLAW.COM
954-713-1284
Party name: Harry Franklin Phillips