No. 23A1164 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Charles Grover Brant, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-13124)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1164) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2024 to September 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 27 2024Application (23A1164) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
    Counsel of Record
Samuels Parmer Law, P.A.
P.O. Box 18988
Tampa, FL 33679

MARIE@SAMUELSPARMERLAW.COM
813-732-3321
Party name: Charles Brant