No. 23A1159
Title:Lamont Fitch, Applicant
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:June 26, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-40131)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1159) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2024 to July 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 27 2024Application (23A1159) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lamont Fitch
    Counsel of Record
12384-050
USP Victorville
P.O. Box 3900
Adelanto, CA 92301

Party name: Lamont Fitch
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.