No. 23A1155
Title:Binance, et al., Applicants
v.
JD Anderson, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-972)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1155) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2024 to September 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1155) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Herbert S. Washer
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
32 Old Slip
New York, NY 10005

HWasher@cahill.com
2127013435
Party name: Binance Holdings Limited