No. 23A1154
Title:Timothy Scott Hardin, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-4432)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1154) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2024 to August 14, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 26 2024Application (23A1154) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Brown Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of Western North Carolina, Inc.
1 Page Ave., Suite 210
Asheville, NC 28801

joshua_carpenter@fd.org
828-232-9992
Party name: Timothy Hardin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States