No. 23A1153
Title:James G. Robinson, et al., Applicants
v.
Armin Azod, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-56186)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1153) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1153) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Fred D. Heather
    Counsel of Record
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Jordan & Shapiro, LLP
10250 Constellation Blvd.
19th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

fheather@glaserweil.com
3105533000
Party name: James G. Robinson, et al.