No. 23A1151 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Devin Allen Bennett, Applicant
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2021-CA-01313-SCT)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1151) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 17, 2024 to September 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 27 2024Application (23A1151) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Krissy Casey Nobile
    Counsel of Record
MS Office of Capital Post-Conviction Counsel
239 N. Lamar Street
Suite 404
Jackson, MS 39201

knobile@pcc.state.ms.us
6624019643
Party name: Devin Bennett