No. 23A1150
Title:Lindsey Gremont, et al., Applicants
v.
Jane Nelson, Texas Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10936)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1150) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1150) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lindsey Gremont
    Counsel of Record
307 Westhaven Drive
West Lake Hills, TX 78746

(512) 879-7069
Party name: Lindsey Gremont, et al.