No. 23A1149
Title:James W. Johnson, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2845)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1149) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2024 to September 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 28 2024Application (23A1149) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 10, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Renee Domenique Pietropaolo
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1500 Liberty Center
1001 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

renee_pietropaolo@fd.org
4126446565
Party name: James Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America