No. 23A1148
Title:Mark Manuel Angeles Marino, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-13883)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1148) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherOther
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1148) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meghan Collins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
201 S. Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

MEGHAN_BOYLE@FD.ORG
407-648-6338
Party name: Mark Marino
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States