No. 23A1143
Title:George C. Cleveland, III, et al., Applicants
v.
South Carolina Department of Social Services
Docketed:June 24, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(2022-000494)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2024Application (23A1143) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 4, 2024 to August 3, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1143) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 3, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
George C. Cleveland III
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 94
Townville, SC 29689

(864) 784-7223
Party name: George Cleveland, et al.