No. 23A1142
Title:Nancy Landry, Louisiana Secretary of State, et al., Applicants
v.
Phillip Callais, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(3:24-cv-00122)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1142) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from June 30, 2024 to August 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 18 2024Response to application from respondents Phillip Callais, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1142) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 30, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Department of Justice
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

aguinagaj@ag.louisiana.gov
225-506-3746
Party name: Nancy Landry, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett Greim LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-3181
Party name: Phillip Callais, et al.