No. 23A1141
Title:Saleh Shaiban, Applicant
v.
Ur Jaddou, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2010)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2024Application (23A1141) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 19 2024Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1141) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Hyrum Adams
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
615 Second Avenue
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98104

matt@nwirp.org
206-957-8611
Party name: Saleh Shaiban
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Jaddou, Ur, et al.